There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

ACCESS BROADBAND Act
Advancing Critical Connectivity Expands Service, Small Business Resources, Opportunities, Access, and Data Based on Assessed Need and Demand Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

ACCESS BROADBAND Act
Advancing Critical Connectivity Expands Service, Small Business Resources, Opportunities, Access, and Data Based on Assessed Need and Demand Act

Short Titles as Introduced

ACCESS BROADBAND Act
Advancing Critical Connectivity Expands Service, Small Business Resources, Opportunities, Access, and Data Based on Assessed Need and Demand Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Office of Internet Connectivity and Growth, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6608-6609)
07/18/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-841.
10/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/23/2018-3:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-3:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6608-6609)
07/23/2018-3:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3994.
07/23/2018-3:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6608-6610)
07/23/2018-3:24pmHouseMr. Lance moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 650.
07/18/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-841.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/13/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
06/13/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology
10/13/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
10/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/06/2017 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
07/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-841
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology10/13/2017 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
06/13/2018 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/24/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3994. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/23/2018)

Advancing Critical Connectivity Expands Service, Small Business Resources, Opportunities, Access, and Data Based on Assessed Need and Demand Act or the ACCESS BROADBAND Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Commerce to establish the Office of Internet Connectivity and Growth within the National Telecommunications and Information Administration.

(Sec. 3) The office shall:

  • connect with communities that need access to high-speed Internet and improved digital inclusion efforts,
  • hold regional workshops to share best practices and effective strategies for promoting broadband access and adoption,
  • develop targeted broadband training and presentations for various demographic communities through media,
  • develop and distribute publications providing guidance to communities for expanding broadband access and adoption, and
  • track construction and use of and access to any broadband infrastructure built using federal support.

The office must report annually: (1) a description of the office's work, (2) the number of U.S. residents who received broadband as result of federal broadband programs and the Universal Service Fund program, and (3) an estimate of the economic impact of such broadband deployment efforts on the local economy.

(Sec. 4) The office shall consult with any agency offering a federal broadband support program in order to streamline the application process for financial assistance or grants and create one application that may be submitted to apply for all federal broadband support programs.

(Sec. 5) The office, any agency that offers a federal broadband support program, and the Federal Communications Commission through the Universal Service Fund shall coordinate to ensure that broadband support is being distributed in an efficient, technology-neutral, and financially sustainable manner.

(Sec. 7) No additional funds are authorized to carry out this bill.