There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protecting Access to the Courts for Taxpayers Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Access to the Courts for Taxpayers Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Access to the Courts for Taxpayers Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Access to the Courts for Taxpayers Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Access to the Courts for Taxpayers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 28, United States Code, to permit other courts to transfer certain cases to United States Tax Court.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2018Became Public Law No: 115-332. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7453)
03/14/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1570)
03/14/2018Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-598.
10/10/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2018Became Public Law No: 115-332. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018HousePresented to President.
12/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/11/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7453)
03/15/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
03/14/2018-3:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2018-3:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1570)
03/14/2018-3:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3996.
03/14/2018-3:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1570)
03/14/2018-3:12pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/14/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 455.
03/14/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-598.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/10/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/10/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/13/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/10/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
03/14/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-598
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet10/10/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary03/15/2018 Referred to
12/11/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3996. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-332 (12/19/2018)

Protecting Access to the Courts for Taxpayers Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal judicial code to authorize a U.S. district court, a U.S. court of appeals, the U.S. Court of Federal Claims, or the Court of International Trade to transfer to the U.S. Tax Court a misfiled case within the Tax Court's jurisdiction.