There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit the manufacture, possession, or transfer of any part or combination of parts that is designed and functions to increase the rate of fire of a semiautomatic rifle but does not convert the semiautomatic rifle into a machinegun, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/10/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/10/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/10/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 10/10/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 10/10/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 10/10/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/11/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/11/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 10/11/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/11/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 11/13/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 11/13/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 02/26/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/26/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/27/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/05/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/19/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/19/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/19/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/10/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations10/19/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3999. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/10/2017)

This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit certain conduct with respect to any part or combination of parts that is designed and functions to increase the rate of fire of a semiautomatic rifle but does not convert the semiautomatic rifle into a machine gun.

Specifically, it makes it a crime to manufacture, possess, or transfer such device: (1) in or affecting interstate or foreign commerce, or (2) that has been shipped or transported in interstate or foreign commerce.

An individual who knowingly violates the prohibition is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both.

Additionally, the U.S. Sentencing Commission must review and amend the sentencing guidelines and policy statements to provide an enhanced penalty if the device has been: (1) used, carried, or possessed during or in relation to a crime of violence or drug trafficking crime; or (2) unlawfully smuggled into or from the United States.