There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

2020 American Census Investment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making appropriations for the Bureau of the Census for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2018.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/11/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
10/11/2017Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/11/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/11/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/11/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/11/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 10/11/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/11/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/11/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/12/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/12/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/12/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/23/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/23/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/23/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/23/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/23/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/23/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/23/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/23/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/24/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/24/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/24/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/03/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/08/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/16/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/16/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/29/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/29/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/06/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations10/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/11/2017)

2020 American Census Investment Act

This bill provides FY2018 appropriations to the Bureau of the Census, including: (1) $300 million for Current Surveys and Programs, and (2) $1.635 billion for Period Censuses and Programs.