There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Title IX Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Department of Education Organization Act to codify into law the "Revised Sexual Harassment Guidance: Harassment of Students by School Employees, Other Students, or Third Parties", issued January 19, 2001, by the Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Education, as in effect on January 1, 2017; the Dear Colleague letter issued April 4, 2011, by the Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Education, as in effect on January 1, 2017; and the "Questions and Answers on Title IX and Sexual Violence" issued April 29, 2014, by the Office for Civil Rights of the Department of Education, as in effect on January 1, 2017.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
10/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 10/23/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 10/23/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/26/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/06/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/06/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/08/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 11/21/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/18/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/07/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/30/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce10/12/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4030.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4030. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2017)

Title IX Protection Act

This bill amends the Department of Education Organization Act to require recipients of federal financial assistance to comply with specified procedural requirements when responding to sexual harassment and sexual violence to prevent and effectively respond to sexual discrimination as required by title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972.