There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To confirm undocumented Federal rights-of-way or easements on the Gila River Indian Reservation, clarify the northern boundary of the Gila River Indian Community's Reservation, to take certain land located in Maricopa County and Pinal County, Arizona, into trust for the benefit of the Gila River Indian Community, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-350.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/19/2018Presented to President.
12/13/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S7578)
11/29/2018Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-399.
07/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6340-6341)
07/13/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-817.
10/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-350.
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/19/2018HousePresented to President.
12/17/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7578)
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 699.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-399.
11/28/2018SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/14/2018SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-435.
07/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
07/17/2018-6:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2018-6:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6340-6341)
07/17/2018-6:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4032.
07/17/2018-6:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6340-6342)
07/17/2018-6:10pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/13/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 633.
07/13/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-817.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
02/06/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
10/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
10/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 10/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/12/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
07/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-817
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands10/16/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs10/16/2017 Referred to
02/06/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs07/18/2018 Referred to
11/14/2018 Hearings by
11/28/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-399

No related bill information was received for H.R.4032.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4032. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-350 (12/21/2018)

Gila River Indian Community Federal Rights-of-Way, Easements and Boundary Clarification Act

(Sec. 4) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to take into trust 3,400 acres of land in Arizona, known as the Lower Sonoran Lands, for the benefit of the Gila River Indian Community, a government composed of members of the Pima Tribe and the Maricopa Tribe. After the lands are taken into trust, they must be treated as part of the community's reservation.

Gaming is prohibited on the land taken into trust.

(Sec. 5) The bill establishes a fixed, permanent boundary for the reservation's northern boundary.

(Sec. 6) The benefits realized by the community, its members, and allottees under this bill satisfy their claims against the United States in connection with alleged failures relating to: (1) establishing and documenting federal rights-of-way on the reservation; and (2) establishing, maintaining, and defending the northern boundary.

(Sec. 7) The bill establishes, ratifies, documents, and confirms federal rights-of-way and easements within the reservation.

(Sec. 8) Within six years, the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) must publish a survey of each of the federal rights-of-way established under this bill. Upon completion of the surveys, the community and BIA may remove a federal right-of-way.