Committees: H.R.4032 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources10/12/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
07/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-817
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands10/16/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs10/16/2017 Referred to
02/06/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs07/18/2018 Referred to
11/14/2018 Hearings by
11/28/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-399