Text: H.R.4041 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4041


To provide for the retention and service of transgender members of the Armed Forces.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 12, 2017

Ms. Speier (for herself, Mr. Dent, Mrs. Davis of California, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, Mr. Smith of Washington, and Ms. Sinema) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Armed Services


A BILL

To provide for the retention and service of transgender members of the Armed Forces.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Retention and service of transgender members of the Armed Forces.

(a) Sense of Congress.—It is the sense of Congress that individuals who are qualified and can meet the standards to serve in the military should be eligible to serve.

(b) Certain actions relating to currently serving members of the Armed Forces.—A currently serving member of the Armed Forces may not be involuntarily separated from the Armed Forces, or denied reenlistment or continuation in service in the Armed Forces, solely on the basis of the member's gender identity. Nothing in this subsection relieves a member from meeting applicable military and medical standards, including deployability, or requires retention of the member in service if the member fails to meet such standards.

(c) Review of accession of transgender individuals into the Armed Forces.—

(1) DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF REVIEW.—The Secretary of Defense shall complete the review of policy on the accession of transgender individuals into the Armed Forces announced by the Secretary on June 30, 2017, by not later than December 31, 2017.

(2) REPORT.—Not later than February 21, 2018, the Secretary shall submit to Congress a comprehensive report on the results of the review of policy described in paragraph (1).