There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

75th Anniversary of the End of World War II Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the minting of a coin in honor of the 75th anniversary of the end of World War II, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
10/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 10/12/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 10/12/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/26/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/26/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 10/26/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 10/26/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 10/26/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/26/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/26/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/26/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/06/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 11/06/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 11/06/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/06/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 11/06/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/06/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/30/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/30/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/18/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/18/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/11/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/19/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/19/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/15/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/15/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/15/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/15/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/15/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/18/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/18/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/05/2018
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/05/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/05/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/05/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/28/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4044. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2017)

75th Anniversary of the End of World War II Commemorative Coin Act

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 coins, 500,000 $1 coins, and 750,000 half-dollar coins in commemoration of the 75th anniversary of the end of World War II.

The coins shall be emblematic of the sacrifices made by millions of people of the United States 75 years ago in bringing an end to World War II. The design on each coin shall represent the World War II Victory Medal, which was awarded to all 16 million U.S. military personnel who served from December 7, 1941, to December 31, 1946.

The bill requires all sales of such coins include specified surcharges, which shall be paid by Treasury to the congressionally designated National WWII Museum to fund its educational mission of telling the story of the U.S. experience in World War II.