There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SALE Act of 2017
Securing All Livestock Equitably Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Packers and Stockyards Act, 1921, to provide for the establishment of a trust for the benefit of all unpaid cash sellers of livestock, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/26/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
10/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 10/12/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 10/26/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/26/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 10/26/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/26/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 10/26/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/26/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 10/26/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 11/03/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/03/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 11/03/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 11/03/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 11/16/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/16/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/16/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 11/16/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 11/16/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/16/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/16/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/16/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/16/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/29/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/29/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/29/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 12/07/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/07/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 12/07/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 12/20/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/20/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/20/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/05/2018
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/26/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/05/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture10/12/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture10/26/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4058. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2017)

Securing All Livestock Equitably Act of 2017 or the SALE Act of 2017

This bill amends the Packers and Stockyards Act, 1921 to require all livestock purchased by a dealer in cash sales and all inventories of, or receivables or proceeds from, such livestock to be held by the dealer in a trust until all unpaid cash sellers of the livestock have been paid. The bill exempts from the requirement any dealer whose average annual purchases of livestock do not exceed $500,000.