There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Ethical Patient Care for Veterans Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure that physicians of the Department of Veterans Affairs fulfill the ethical duty to report to State licensing authorities impaired, incompetent, and unethical health care activities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
10/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 11/01/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 11/16/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/11/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/12/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4059.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4059. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/12/2017)

Ethical Patient Care for Veterans Act of 2017

This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that each VA physician is informed of the duty to report any covered activity committed by another physician that the physician witnesses or otherwise directly discovers to the applicable state licensing authority within five days.

"Covered activity" means any activity occurring in a VA medical facility that consists of or causes the provision of impaired, incompetent, or unethical health care that requires direct reporting under the Code of Medical Ethics of the American Medical Association.