There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Financial Stability Oversight Council Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Financial Stability Oversight Council Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Financial Stability Oversight Council Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Financial Stability Act of 2010 to improve the transparency of the Financial Stability Oversight Council, to improve the SIFI designation process, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/11/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 297 - 121 (Roll no. 135).(text: CR H3119-3121)
03/09/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-592.
10/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
04/12/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
04/11/2018-4:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/11/2018-4:54pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 297 - 121 (Roll no. 135). (text: CR H3119-3121)
04/11/2018-4:26pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/11/2018-3:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4061.
04/11/2018-3:24pmHouseThe resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules.
04/11/2018-3:24pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 780. (consideration: CR H3119-3128)
03/14/2018-5:55pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 780 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules.
03/09/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450.
03/09/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-592.
01/18/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 10.
01/18/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
10/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 10/12/2017
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 10/12/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/12/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/13/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/13/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/13/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 12/13/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 12/13/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 12/13/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 12/13/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 01/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/12/2017 Referred to
01/18/2018 Markup by
03/09/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-592
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4061. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/11/2018)

Financial Stability Oversight Council Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Financial Stability Act of 2010 to require the Financial Stability Oversight Council, in determining whether a nonbank financial company shall be designated as systemically important and consequently be supervised by the Federal Reserve Board and subject to prudential standards, to consider the appropriateness of imposing such standards as opposed to other forms of regulation to mitigate identified risks to U.S. financial stability.

The bill revises procedural requirements related to council determinations of systemic importance. Specifically, the council must: (1) provide an opportunity, during an annual reevaluation of such a determination for a nonbank financial company, for the company to submit written materials to, and meet with, the council in order to contest the determination; (2) every five years, upon request by a nonbank financial company, reevaluate such a determination and hold a vote on whether to rescind it; and (3) undertake certain procedures for initial evaluations.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends the Federal Reserve Act to lower the maximum allowable amount of surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks.