There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Competitive DRUGS Act of 2017
Competitive Deals Resulting in Unleashed Generics and Savings Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit brand name drug companies from compensating generic drug companies to delay the entry of a generic drug into the market, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
10/27/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/25/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/25/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/28/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/18/2018
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/11/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/15/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/19/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/19/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/19/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/19/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/19/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/19/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/04/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/30/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means10/25/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary10/25/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce10/25/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection10/27/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4117.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/25/2017)

Competitive Deals Resulting in Unleashed Generics and Savings Act of 2017 or the Competitive DRUGS Act of 2017

This bill establishes a series of requirements and prohibitions regarding certain patent infringement agreements between brand name and generic drug manufacturers in which the generic drug manufacturer agrees to delay the availability of applicable generic drugs. Among other things, the bill specifies that such agreements constitute an unfair method of competition and are subject to specified civil penalties.