There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

No Abortion Bonds Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to impose federal taxes on bonds used to provide facilities owned by abortion providers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/25/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/25/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8154)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 10/25/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/26/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 10/31/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/31/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/31/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/31/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/31/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/31/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 11/01/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/01/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/01/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 11/01/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/01/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 11/01/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/01/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 11/02/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/03/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/03/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/06/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/06/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/07/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/09/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/13/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/15/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/15/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 11/15/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/16/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 11/21/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/28/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 12/20/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/16/2018
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/16/2018
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 01/16/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 01/16/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/16/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 01/17/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/17/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 01/19/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/19/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 01/19/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 01/19/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 01/19/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/19/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/08/2018
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 02/13/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 02/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/25/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4131.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4131. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/25/2017)

No Abortion Bonds Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose taxes on state, local, and tax credit bonds that are used to provide a facility owned or used (for any purpose) by an abortion provider for more than 30 days during a year in which interest is paid on the bond.

An entity is not considered an abortion provider solely as a result of performing abortions if: (1) the pregnancy is the result of an act of rape or incest; or (2) a woman suffers from a physical disorder, physical injury, or physical illness that would, as certified by a physician, place the woman in danger of death unless an abortion is performed, including a life-endangering physical condition caused by or arising from the pregnancy itself.

The Department of the Treasury may exempt certain hospitals from being considered an abortion provider by making the name of the hospital available on Treasury's public website.