There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Renewable Electricity Tax Credit Equalization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the credit for electricity produced from certain renewable resources and the investment credit for certain qualified investment credit facilities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
10/25/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/09/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 03/05/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/21/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means10/25/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4137.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/25/2017)

Renewable Electricity Tax Credit Equalization Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credits for investments in energy property and for electricity produced from certain renewable resources, to extend both credits for the following facilities placed in service after 2008 with construction that begins before January 1, 2022:

  • closed-loop biomass,
  • open-loop biomass,
  • geothermal,
  • landfill gas,
  • trash facilities,
  • qualified hydropower facilities, and
  • marine and hydrokinetic renewable energy facilities.

The bill also includes a phase-out schedule that reduces the amounts of the credits by specified amounts that increase for facilities that are constructed or placed in service later.