There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Sexual Harassment Training Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to require employing offices under such Act to enroll the employees of such offices every two years in the program carried out by the Office of Compliance to train employees in the protections against sexual harassment provided under the Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/26/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
10/26/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/26/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/26/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 10/27/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 10/27/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/31/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/31/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 10/31/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/31/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/31/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/31/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/31/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/31/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/31/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/31/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/01/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/01/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/01/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/01/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/01/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/01/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/01/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 11/01/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/01/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 11/01/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/02/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/02/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/02/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/02/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 11/02/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/03/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 11/03/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/03/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/03/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/03/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/03/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/03/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 11/03/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/03/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/03/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/03/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/03/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/03/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/03/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/07/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/07/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/07/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/07/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 11/07/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/07/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 11/07/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 11/07/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/07/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/15/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/15/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 11/15/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/15/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 11/15/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/15/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 11/15/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/28/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/28/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 11/28/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 11/28/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/28/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/01/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 01/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration10/26/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4155.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4155. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/26/2017)

Congressional Sexual Harassment Training Act

This bill amends the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to require each employing office under the Act to ensure that its covered employees enroll in the Office of Compliance's program of education that informs employees of the rights provided under the Act against sexual harassment: (1) within 60 days after first becoming an employee; (2) for existing employees, within 90 days after enactment of this bill; and (3) every two years.