There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to extend the authority to conduct telework travel expenses test programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9814)
12/11/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-460.
10/31/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
12/12/2017-2:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2017-2:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9814)
12/12/2017-2:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4171.
12/12/2017-2:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9814-9815)
12/12/2017-2:21pmHouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342.
12/11/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-460.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
10/31/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/31/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/31/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/31/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
12/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-460
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4171. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/31/2017)

This bill extends the authority of federal agencies to conduct telework travel expenses test programs until December 31, 2020.