There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (13)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Foundations for Evidence-Based Policymaking Act of 2018

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • Confidential Information Protection and Statistical Efficiency Act of 2018
  • OPEN Government Data Act
  • Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Foundations for Evidence-Based Policymaking Act of 2017

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Confidential Information Protection and Statistical Efficiency Act of 2017
  • OPEN Government Data Act
  • Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Foundations for Evidence-Based Policymaking Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Confidential Information Protection and Statistical Efficiency Act of 2017
  • OPEN Government Data Act
  • Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 5 and 44, United States Code, to require Federal evaluation activities, improve Federal data management, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-435.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/21/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 356 - 17 (Roll no. 484).
12/19/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7871-7878)
12/19/2018Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9281-9288)
11/15/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-411.
10/31/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-435.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019HousePresented to President.
12/31/2018-1:08pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 149, enrollment corrections on H.R. 4174 have been made.
12/21/2018-4:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-4:15pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 356 - 17 (Roll no. 484).
12/21/2018-9:26amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-9:25amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 4174.
12/21/2018-9:24amHouseMr. Walker moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10518-10526; text as House agree to Senate amendment: CR H10518-10525)
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/19/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7871-7878)
12/19/2018SenateS.Amdt.4171 Amendment SA 4171 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/19/2018SenateS.Amdt.4171 Amendment SA 4171 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S7870-7871; text: CR S7871-7878) In the nature of a substitute.
12/19/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7870-7878)
12/19/2018SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/15/2017-3:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/15/2017-3:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9281-9288)
11/15/2017-2:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4174.
11/15/2017-2:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9281-9291)
11/15/2017-2:39pmHouseMr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/15/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
11/15/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-411.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/31/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/31/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 10/31/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/31/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/31/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/31/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/15/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-411
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/16/2017 Referred to
12/19/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4174. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/31/2017)

Foundations for Evidence-Based Policymaking Act of 2017

This bill requires departments and agencies identified in the Chief Financial Officers Act to submit annually to the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) and Congress a plan for identifying and addressing policy questions relevant to the programs, policies, and regulations of such departments and agencies.The plan must include: (1) a list of policy-relevant questions for developing evidence to support policymaking, and (2) a list of data for facilitating the use of evidence in policymaking.

The OMB shall consolidate such plans into a unified evidence building plan.

The bill establishes an Interagency Council on Evaluation Policy to assist the OMB in supporting government-wide evaluation activities and policies. The bill defines "evaluation" to mean an assessment using systematic data collection and analysis of one or more programs, policies, and organizations intended to assess their effectiveness and efficiency.

Each department or agency shall designate a Chief Evaluation Officer to coordinate evidence-building activities and an official with statistical expertise to advise on statistical policy, techniques, and procedures.

The OMB shall establish an Advisory Committee on Data for Evidence Building to advise on expanding access to and use of federal data for evidence building.

Open, Public, Electronic, and Necessary Government Data Act or the OPEN Government Data Act

This bill requires open government data assets to be published as machine-readable data.

Each agency shall: (1) develop and maintain a comprehensive data inventory for all data assets created by or collected by the agency, and (2) designate a Chief Data Officer who shall be responsible for lifecycle data management and other specified functions.

The bill establishes in the OMB a Chief Data Officer Council for establishing government-wide best practices for the use, protection, dissemination, and generation of data and for promoting data sharing agreements among agencies.

Confidential Information Protection and Statistical Efficiency Act of 2017

This bill codifies provisions relating to confidential information protection and statistical efficiency.