There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PREPARE Act of 2017
Preparedness and Risk Management for Extreme Weather Patterns Assuring Resilience and Effectiveness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance the Federal Government's planning and preparation for extreme weather and the Federal Government's dissemination of best practices to respond to extreme weather, thereby increasing resilience, improving regional coordination, and mitigating the financial risk to the Federal Government from such extreme weather, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/28/2018Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
11/14/2018Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1028, Part I.
10/31/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 866.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2018House Committee on Oversight and Government Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2018Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-1028, Part I.
04/12/2018Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/12/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/12/2018Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
04/12/2018Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
11/02/2017Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
11/02/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/01/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
10/31/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/31/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/31/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/31/2017 Referred to
04/12/2018 Markup by
11/14/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1028
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management11/01/2017 Referred to
04/12/2018 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment11/01/2017 Referred to
04/12/2018 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform10/31/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
12/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4177. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/31/2017)

Preparedness and Risk Management for Extreme Weather Patterns Assuring Resilience and Effectiveness Act of 2017 or the PREPARE Act of 2017

This bill directs the President to establish the Interagency Council on Extreme Weather Resilience, Preparedness, and Risk Identification and Management (council), which shall: (1) establish government-wide goals for extreme weather resilience, preparedness, and risk identification and management (EWR); (2) develop, recommend, coordinate, and track implementation of priority interagency federal government actions related to EWR; (3) provide recommendations to the Council on Environmental Quality, the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), and the Department of Homeland Security on how agencies should develop or update agency extreme weather plans, remove barriers to state and local EWR in agency regulations, guidance, and policy, and avoid duplication among federal activities; (4) issue guidance to agencies on developing agency extreme weather plans and agency regulations, guidance, and policies to remove barriers to state and local EWR; and (5) publish biannually an inventory of all regional agency offices, centers, and programs that assist with EWR at the state or local level.

OMB shall ensure that each agency provides adequate resources to the council.

Each agency shall submit biannually to OMB and to the council a comprehensive plan that integrates consideration of extreme weather into its operations and overall mission objectives. OMB shall consolidate and submit such plans to Congress.

Annual agency performance plans shall include the most recent agency extreme weather plan.