There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

EQUALS Act of 2017
Ensuring a Qualified Civil Service Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to modify probationary periods with respect to positions within the competitive service and the Senior Executive Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
11/30/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 213 - 204 (Roll no. 648).
11/28/2017Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Oversight and Government, H. Rept. 115-415, Part II.
11/16/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-415.
10/31/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber
12/01/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
11/30/2017-4:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/30/2017-4:52pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 213 - 204 (Roll no. 648).
11/30/2017-4:46pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
11/30/2017-4:45pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
11/30/2017-4:45pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 4182.
11/30/2017-4:45pmHouseH.Amdt.491 On agreeing to the Connolly amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 193 - 223 (Roll no. 647).
11/30/2017-4:38pmHouseH.Amdt.489 On agreeing to the Hastings amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 195 - 221 (Roll no. 646).
11/30/2017-4:11pmHouseUNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on adoption of amendments, which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
11/30/2017-4:10pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Connolly amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Connolly demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
11/30/2017-4:03pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 635, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Connolly amendment no. 4.
11/30/2017-4:03pmHouseH.Amdt.491 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Connolly. (consideration: CR H9555-9556, H9557-9558; text: CR H9555)
11/30/2017-4:02pmHouseH.Amdt.490 On agreeing to the Gianforte amendment (A002) as modified Agreed to by voice vote.
11/30/2017-3:59pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 635, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gianforte amendment no. 3, as modified.
11/30/2017-3:59pmHouseH.Amdt.490 Gianforte amendment (A002) modified by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9555; text as modified: CR H9555)
11/30/2017-3:58pmHouseH.Amdt.490 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gianforte. (consideration: CR H9555; text: CR H9555)
11/30/2017-3:57pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Hastings amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Comer demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
11/30/2017-3:49pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 635, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Hastings amendment no. 1.
11/30/2017-3:49pmHouseH.Amdt.489 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Hastings. (consideration: CR H9554-9555, H9556-9557; text: CR H9554)
11/30/2017-3:19pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 4182.
11/30/2017-3:19pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee.
11/30/2017-3:18pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 635 and Rule XVIII.
11/30/2017-3:18pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 and H.R. 1699. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 1699 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
11/30/2017-3:18pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 635. (consideration: CR H9547-9559; text of measure as reported in House: CR H9553-9554)
11/29/2017-5:19pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 635 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 and H.R. 1699. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 1699 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
11/28/2017HouseSupplemental report filed by the Committee on Oversight and Government, H. Rept. 115-415, Part II.
11/16/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
11/16/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-415.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 17.
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/31/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/31/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 10/31/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 10/31/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 11/01/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform10/31/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-415
H. Rept. 115-415,Part 2
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4182. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/31/2017)

Ensuring a Qualified Civil Service Act of 2017 or the EQUALS Act of 2017

This bill requires the probationary period before an appointment in the competitive civil service or an initial appointment as a supervisor or manager becomes final to last for two years. The two-year probationary period applies to any position that requires formal training or a license, and any other position not requiring formal training or a license.

Each agency must ensure that: (1) an announcement of a vacant position and an offer of appointment clearly state the terms and conditions of the probationary period, (2) an individual who is required to complete a probationary period receives timely notice of requirements to successfully complete the probationary period, (3) a supervisor or manager of an individual who is required to complete the probationary period receives notification not less than 30 days before the end of the probationary period, and (4) certification of such successful completion is made.

The bill increases from one to two years: (1) the probationary period after which an individual's appointment as a career appointee in the Senior Executive Service becomes final, and (2) the continuous employment requirement for coverage under adverse action procedures for misconduct.