There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

America Wins Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rebuild the Nation's infrastructure, provide a consumer rebate to the American people, assist coal country, reduce harmful pollution, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/14/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/02/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means11/01/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/01/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation11/02/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit11/02/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials11/02/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment11/02/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce11/01/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment11/03/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture11/01/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce11/01/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources11/01/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources11/14/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology11/01/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Energy05/22/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4209.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4209. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/01/2017)

America Wins Act

The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose an excise tax on the carbon dioxide content of coal, petroleum and petroleum products, and natural gas sold by the manufacturer, producer, or importer and require the revenues to be used for infrastructure and other purposes.

Refunds or credits for the tax must be issued for carbon substances that are: (1) not emitted due to use as a feedstock or through carbon capture and sequestration, or (2) previously taxed carbon substances used to make another taxable carbon substance.

The bill includes border adjustment provisions that require certain fees, credits, or refunds for carbon-intensive goods that are exported or imported.

The bill also establishes a Build America Trust Fund and appropriates to the fund amounts equal to the increase in revenues attributable to the tax. Specified amounts of the funds must be used, without further appropriation, for infrastructure, including

  • highways and transit;
  • aviation;
  • passenger rail;
  • harbors, waterways, flood protection, and dams;
  • clean water;
  • Department of Agriculture water and waste disposal programs; and
  • broadband deployment.

Specified portions of the funds must also be used for:

  • providing assistance to workers and communities reliant on industries that primarily produce taxable carbon substances or carbon-intensive goods,
  • an energy refund program to provide payments to certain low-income households, and
  • a refundable tax credit for households that meet specified income requirements.