There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994, to reauthorize the Missing Alzheimer's Disease Patient Alert Program, and to promote initiatives that will reduce the risk of injury and death relating to the wandering characteristics of some children with autism.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
11/30/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (E1621-1622)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/15/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 11/15/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 12/14/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/18/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 01/18/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/18/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/18/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/18/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/18/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/18/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 01/18/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/18/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/18/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 01/29/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 01/29/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/05/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/05/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 02/23/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 02/23/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/20/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/20/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/20/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/20/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/23/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/23/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/23/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/23/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/23/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/23/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/10/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/10/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary11/02/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations11/21/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce11/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4221. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/02/2017)

Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2017

Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2017

This bill amends the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to revise, rename, and reauthorize through FY2022 the Missing Alzheimer's Disease Patient Alert Program.

It directs the Department of Justice's (DOJ's) Bureau of Justice Assistance to award grants:

  • to develop or operate programs to prevent wandering and locate missing individuals with dementia or children with developmental disabilities, and
  • to develop tracking technology programs to locate missing individuals with dementia or children with developmental disabilities.

The bill amends the Missing Children's Assistance Act to specify that, with respect to training and technical assistance provided by the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children, cases involving missing and exploited children include cases involving children with developmental disabilities such as autism.

DOJ must establish and certain grant recipients must comply with standards and best practices related to the use of tracking technology to locate missing individuals with dementia or developmental disabilities.

The bill prohibits the use of data from tracking devices to create a federal database. It also prohibits construing this bill to require a parent or guardian to use a tracking device.