There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BURMA Act of 2017
Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote democracy and human rights in Burma, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 11/02/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/10/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/13/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 12/01/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/01/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/04/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 12/04/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/05/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 12/11/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/12/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 12/13/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/13/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/13/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/13/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/13/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/13/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/16/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/01/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/01/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 03/01/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/01/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/05/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/06/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 03/13/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/13/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/13/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/13/2018
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/14/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/23/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/23/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/23/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 03/29/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/29/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/29/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/29/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 04/18/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/18/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/23/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/08/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/08/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/25/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/02/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services11/02/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary11/02/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services11/02/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means11/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/02/2017)

Burma Unified through Rigorous Military Accountability Act of 2017 or the BURMA Act of 2017

This bill expresses the sense of Congress that the government of Burma (Myanmar) should ensure the safe and voluntary return of displaced people and fully implement the recommendations of the Advisory Commission on Rakhine State.

The U.S. Executive Director of each international financial institution shall use U.S. influence to support only projects in Burma that do not partner or contract with or otherwise benefit any enterprise owned or controlled by the Burmese military.

The United States may not supply security assistance or engage in military programs with the Burmese armed forces or security forces until the Department of Defense certifies that such armed forces have demonstrated significant progress in abiding by international human rights standards and are undertaking significant security sector reform.

U.S. import restrictions on Burmese jadeite and rubies shall remain in effect until the President certifies that Burma has taken substantial measures to reform its gemstone industry.

The President shall: (1) submit a list of each senior Burmese military or security official who has played a substantial role in the commission of human rights abuses or who has failed to investigate human rights abuses, and (2) exclude any such individual from U.S. entry.

The President shall determine whether specified individuals should be included in the list of specially designated nationals and blocked persons maintained by the Department of the Treasury's Office of Foreign Assets Control.

The Department of State, Treasury, and the U.S. Agency for International Development shall jointly submit to Congress an assistance strategy to promote broad-based economic development in Burma.