There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to examine what actions the Department of Homeland Security is undertaking to combat the threat of vehicular terrorism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-400. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 388 - 2 (Roll No. 456).(consideration: CR H10435-10436; text: CR H10414)
12/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2018Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/22/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 2 (Roll no. 125).
03/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-609.
11/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-400. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:25pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 388 - 2 (Roll No. 456). (consideration: CR H10435-10436; text: CR H10414)
12/20/2018-12:32pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-12:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 4227.
12/20/2018-12:27pmHouseMr. Estes (KS) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H10414-10415)
12/19/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4162 Amendment SA 4162 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4162 Amendment SA 4162 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Cassidy. (consideration: CR S7822; text: CR S7822) To modify the bill.
12/18/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7822)
12/18/2018SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/22/2018-11:01amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/22/2018-11:01amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 2 (Roll no. 125).
03/22/2018-10:54amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1767-1768)
03/19/2018-4:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/19/2018-4:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4227.
03/19/2018-4:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1666-1667; text: CR H1666)
03/19/2018-4:31pmHouseMr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 465.
03/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-609.
03/07/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/07/2018HouseSubcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged.
11/28/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
11/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security11/02/2017 Referred to
03/07/2018 Markup by
03/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-609
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence11/28/2017 Referred to
03/07/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/22/2018 Referred to
12/18/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4227. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-400 (12/31/2018)

Vehicular Terrorism Prevention Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS): (1) to assess the activities that DHS is undertaking to support emergency response providers and the private sector to prevent, mitigate, and respond to the threat of vehicular terrorism; and (2) based on such assessment, to develop and submit to the congressional homeland security committees a strategy to improve its efforts to support such providers and the private sector in that regard.

The strategy shall include:

  • an examination of the current threat of vehicular terrorism;
  • methods to improve DHS information sharing activities with such providers and the private sector regarding best practices to prevent, mitigate, and respond to the increasing threat of vehicular terrorism; and
  • training activities that DHS can provide for such providers to prevent and respond to such threat.