Text: H.R.4229 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/02/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 4229


To extend the transition to new payment rates for durable medical equipment under the Medicare program and amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to update the Medicare budget neutrality requirement for oxygen.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

November 2, 2017

Mrs. McMorris Rodgers (for herself, Mr. Aderholt, Mr. Bishop of Georgia, Mrs. Blackburn, Mr. Blum, Mr. Bucshon, Mr. Collins of Georgia, Mr. Collins of New York, Mr. Cook, Mr. Cramer, Mr. Duffy, Mr. Duncan of Tennessee, Mr. Ferguson, Mr. Gallagher, Mr. Gianforte, Mr. Graves of Georgia, Mr. Graves of Missouri, Mr. Griffith, Mr. Harper, Mrs. Hartzler, Mr. Jenkins of West Virginia, Ms. Jenkins of Kansas, Mr. Johnson of Ohio, Mr. Joyce of Ohio, Ms. Kaptur, Mr. Kelly of Pennsylvania, Mr. King of Iowa, Ms. Kuster of New Hampshire, Mr. LaMalfa, Mr. Lamborn, Mr. Latta, Mr. Long, Mr. Luetkemeyer, Mr. Marino, Mr. Marshall, Mr. Moulton, Mrs. Noem, Mr. Rogers of Alabama, Mr. Rothfus, Ms. Sewell of Alabama, Mr. Smith of Missouri, Mr. Tiberi, Mr. Tipton, Mr. Turner, Mrs. Wagner, Mr. Welch, Mr. Young of Iowa, Mr. Ryan of Ohio, Mr. Roe of Tennessee, Mr. Allen, Mr. Visclosky, Mr. Kelly of Mississippi, Mr. Mullin, and Mr. Loebsack) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To extend the transition to new payment rates for durable medical equipment under the Medicare program and amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to update the Medicare budget neutrality requirement for oxygen.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Protecting Home Oxygen & Medical Equipment Access Act of 2017” or the “Protecting HOME Access Act of 2017”.

SEC. 2. Extension of the transition to new payment rates for durable medical equipment under the Medicare program.

(a) In general.—The Secretary of Health and Human Services shall extend the transition period described in clause (i) of section 414.210(g)(9) of title 42, Code of Federal Regulations, from January 1, 2017, to December 31, 2018 (with the full implementation described in clause (ii) of such section applying to items and services furnished with dates of service on or after January 1, 2019).

(b) Payment amount.—Notwithstanding section 414.210(g)(8) of title 42, Code of Federal Regulations, reimbursement rates for applicable items and services applied pursuant to subsection (a) shall be equal to reimbursement rates in effect on January 1, 2016.

SEC. 3. Budget neutrality for oxygen under the Medicare program.

(a) In general.—Section 1834(a)(9)(D)(ii) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395m(a)(9)(D)(ii)) is amended by adding at the end the following new sentence: “The requirement of the preceding sentence shall not apply to an action described in clause (i) with respect to items and services described in such clause for which there is conducted a competitive acquisition program under section 1847(a) or with respect to which payment is adjusted pursuant to clause (ii) or (iii) of paragraph (1)(F).”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by paragraph (1) shall apply with respect to items and services furnished on or after the date that is 30 days after the date of the enactment of this Act.