There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • VA Asset and Infrastructure Review Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a commission for the purpose of making recommendations regarding the modernization or realignment of facilities of the Veterans Health Administration, to improve construction and management leases of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to amend and appropriate funds for the Veterans Choice Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/28/2018Committee on Appropriations discharged.
12/28/2018Committee on Rules discharged.
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1036, Part I.
11/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 867.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Appropriations discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Rules discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018House Committee on Appropriations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1036, Part I.
11/08/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10.
11/08/2017Approved Further Amendments To Measure Previously Reported.
11/08/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs11/03/2017 Referred to
11/08/2017 Markup by
11/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1036
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health11/03/2017 Referred to
House Rules11/03/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from
House Appropriations11/03/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4243. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/03/2017)

VA Asset and Infrastructure Review Act of 2017

This bill establishes the Asset and Infrastructure Review Commission, which shall make recommendations to the President regarding the closure, modernization, and/or realignment of Veterans Health Administration (VHA) facilities based upon its own and Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) recommendations. The President shall transmit to the commission and to Congress a report containing the President's approval or disapproval of such recommendations by February 15, 2023. Within three years after transmittal of such report, the commission shall begin to implement the recommendations approved by the President and not disapproved by Congress.

The commission shall: (1) carry out appropriate environmental restoration and historic preservation in connection with facility closures or realignments, and (2) consult with state and local governments with respect to the treatment of roads or the disposal of surplus real property or infrastructure.

The VA may transfer the title of a VHA facility to the facility's redevelopment authority for lease to the VA or another federal agency.

The bill establishes in the Treasury the Department of Veterans Affairs Asset and Infrastructure Review Account.

The bill revises the definitions of: (1) "major medical facility project," and (2) "major medical facility lease."

The VA may enter into agreements with other federal agencies for the planning, designing, constructing, or leasing of shared medical facilities.

The Veterans Access, Choice, and Accountability Act of 2014 is amended to exclude recruitment, relocation, or retention incentives from the limitation on awards and bonuses.

The bill provides funds for: (1) the Veterans Choice Program, and (2) medical facility minor construction and nonrecurring maintenance.