There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FTO Passport Revocation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

FTO Passport Revocation Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the revocation or denial of passports to individuals affiliated with foreign terrorist organizations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8363)
01/10/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/02/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/01/2017-6:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/01/2017-6:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8363)
11/01/2017-6:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 425.
11/01/2017-6:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8363-8365)
11/01/2017-6:28pmHouseMr. Poe (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/19/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade
07/19/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/10/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/10/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/10/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/18/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/10/2017 Referred to
09/28/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade02/16/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/19/2017 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations11/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.425. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/01/2017)

FTO Passport Revocation Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Passport Act of 1926 to authorize the Department of State to: (1) refuse to issue a passport to an individual who has aided, assisted, abetted, or otherwise helped a foreign terrorist organization designated pursuant to the Immigration and Nationality Act; or (2) revoke a passport previously issued to any such individual;

A person whose passport is denied or revoked may request a State Department hearing within 60 days of receiving notice of such action.

If the State Department refuses to issue or revokes a passport, or if subsequent to a hearing the State Department issues or cancels a revocation of a passport that was the subject of such a hearing, the State Department shall report to Congress within 30 days regarding such action.