There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Other Short Titles

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Women in Aerospace Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Science Foundation Authorization Act of 2002 to strengthen the aerospace workforce pipeline by the promotion of Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship Program and National Aeronautics and Space Administration internship and fellowship opportunities to women, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-303. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018Presented to President.
11/27/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H9580)
09/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6364-6365; text: CR S6364)
08/16/2018Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
12/19/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 17 (Roll no. 690).(text: CR 12/18/2017 H10160)
12/18/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-472.
11/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-303. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018HousePresented to President.
11/27/2018-4:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-4:18pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H9580)
11/27/2018-4:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 4254.
11/27/2018-4:11pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9580-9581)
09/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/27/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6364-6365; text: CR S6364)
08/16/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 557.
08/16/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/27/2018SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
12/20/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/19/2017-12:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2017-12:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 17 (Roll no. 690). (text: CR 12/18/2017 H10160)
12/19/2017-12:06pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10200-10201)
12/18/2017-5:56pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/18/2017-5:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4254.
12/18/2017-5:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10160-10161)
12/18/2017-5:44pmHouseMr. Knight moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/18/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 351.
12/18/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-472.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
11/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology11/06/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
12/18/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-472
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/20/2017 Referred to
06/27/2018 Markup by
08/16/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4254.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4254. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-303 (12/11/2018)

Women in Aerospace Education Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the National Science Foundation Authorization Act of 2002 to permit certain grants awarded by the National Science Foundation (NSF) to be used to provide internships that include research experiences at national laboratories and National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) centers. NSF Master Teaching Fellows and undergraduate freshman and sophomore students studying to become mathematics and science teachers under the Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship Program are eligible for the internships.

(Sec. 3) For internships and fellowships, NASA shall encourage the recruitment of qualified candidates who are women or individuals who are underrepresented in the fields of science, technology, engineering, mathematics, and computer science.