There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Family Self-Sufficiency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Family Self-Sufficiency Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Family Self-Sufficiency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the development of local strategies to coordinate use of assistance under sections 8 and 9 of the United States Housing Act of 1937 with public and private resources, to enable eligible families to achieve economic independence and self-sufficiency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 5 (Roll no. 22).(text: CR 1/16/2018 H178-180)
12/13/2017Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-464.
11/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
01/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
01/17/2018-1:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/17/2018-1:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 5 (Roll no. 22). (text: CR 1/16/2018 H178-180)
01/17/2018-1:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H429-430)
01/16/2018-4:31pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/16/2018-4:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4258.
01/16/2018-4:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H178-181)
01/16/2018-4:17pmHouseMr. Duffy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/13/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 344.
12/13/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-464.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 58 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
11/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/06/2017 Referred to
11/14/2017 Markup by
12/13/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-464
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/18/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.