There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Regulation A+ Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Regulation At Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Regulation At Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Securities Act of 1933 with respect to small company capital formation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/15/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 170 (Roll no. 110).(text: CR H1634)
02/02/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-544.
11/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
03/19/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
03/15/2018-3:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/15/2018-3:56pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 170 (Roll no. 110). (text: CR H1634)
03/15/2018-3:49pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 235 (Roll no. 109).
03/15/2018-3:19pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
03/15/2018-3:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike "$75,000,000" and insert "$50,000,000" on Page 3, line 10; and on Page 3, line 23, insert the following new section entitled: "Effect of Increase in Offering Limit".
03/15/2018-3:10pmHouseMrs. Beatty moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (CR H1640)
03/15/2018-3:09pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/15/2018-2:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4263.
03/15/2018-2:16pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545, H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545 under a structured rule, and makes in order amendments printed in the report, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263 under closed rules. The rule provides for one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Minority Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
03/15/2018-2:16pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 773. (consideration: CR H1634-1642)
03/14/2018-2:52pmHouseRule H. Res. 773 passed House.
03/13/2018-6:45pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 773 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545, H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4545 under a structured rule, and makes in order amendments printed in the report, with one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule also provides for consideration of H.R. 1116 and H.R. 4263 under closed rules. The rule provides for one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Minority Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
02/02/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
02/02/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-544.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 23.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
11/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/14/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 11/14/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/14/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 11/15/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/07/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
02/02/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-544
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4263. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/15/2018)

Regulation A+ Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Act of 1933 to increase the dollar limit of certain securities offerings exempt from registration requirements from $50 million annually to $75 million annually, adjusted in future years for inflation.