There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Sugar Policy Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize the sugar program under the Federal Agriculture Improvement and Reform Act of 1996, to provide for the repeal of the feedstock flexibility program for bioenergy producers under the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 and marketing allotments for sugar under the Agricultural Adjustment Act of 1938, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 11/13/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/14/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/15/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/28/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 11/30/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/05/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/13/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/14/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/18/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 01/30/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/02/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/02/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/06/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/07/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/23/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 03/06/2018
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/06/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/13/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/15/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 03/19/2018
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/19/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/19/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/20/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/11/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/12/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/16/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/18/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/18/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/23/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/25/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/26/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 04/27/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/07/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/07/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/05/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/11/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 07/16/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/28/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture11/07/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means11/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4265. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/07/2017)

Sugar Policy Modernization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Federal Agriculture Improvement and Reform Act of 1996 and other agricultural laws to modify the Department of Agriculture (USDA) sugar program.

The bill modifies the sugar program to:

  • reduce the rates for price support loans to processors of domestically grown sugarcane and sugar beets;
  • require USDA to recover the net cost of the program from domestic sugar processors;
  • extend through 2019 and then terminate the Feedstock Flexibility Program under which USDA purchases surplus sugar from domestic processors for resale to ethanol producers;
  • extend through 2020 and then repeal the flexible marketing allotments which limit the amount of sugar that domestic processing companies may sell for domestic human use;
  • require USDA to administer the program to provide adequate supplies of sugar at reasonable prices;
  • require USDA to adjust sugar tariff-rate quota imports to achieve specified ratios of sugar stocks to total sugar use; and
  • allow the transfer of quotas between countries.