There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify the boundary of Acadia National Park, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1518)
01/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-526.
11/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/13/2018-5:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/13/2018-5:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1518)
03/13/2018-5:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4266.
03/13/2018-5:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1518-1520)
03/13/2018-5:20pmHouseMr. Curtis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 391.
01/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-526.
12/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
11/15/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
11/15/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
11/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
11/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources11/07/2017 Referred to
12/12/2017 Markup by
12/13/2017 Markup by
01/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-526
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands11/15/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Hearings by
12/12/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/14/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4266. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/07/2017)

Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act

This bill confirms that the boundary of Acadia National Park in Maine includes approximately 1,441 acres of land and interests in the Schoodic Peninsula.

The bill ratifies and approves:

  • the acquisition by the United States of such land and interests, effective as of September 26, 2013; and
  • any alteration of such land or interests held or claimed by the United State that occurred after such date.

The Department of the Interior may make technical boundary and limited boundary revisions, as appropriate, to the permanent boundaries of the park (including any park property located within the peninsula and Isle Au Haut districts) to resolve issues resulting from causes such as survey error or changed road alignments or to take into account acquisitions or losses of land adjacent to or within the park in any case in which the total acreage of the land to be so acquired or lost is less than 10 acres, subject to specified conditions.

Interior shall contribute a specified amount to a regional consortium composed of units of local government on or in the vicinity of Mount Desert Island that was established to improve the management of the disposal and recycling of solid waste.

Interior shall reestablish and appoint members to the Acadia National Park Advisory Commission.

Certain land in the park that was conveyed by Interior to the town of Tremont, Maine, shall no longer be used exclusively for school purposes, but for public purposes, subject to the conditions that: (1) use of such land shall not degrade or adversely impact the park's resources or values; and (2) such land shall remain in public ownership for recreational, educational, or similar public purposes.

Interior shall allow for the traditional harvesting of the marine worms, clams, and other shellfish, and other marine species in accordance with the laws of the state of Maine: (1) within the park's boundaries, and (2) on any land outside of the park in which Interior has or obtains a property interest.

Interior shall convey to the town of Bar Harbor a specified parcel of land within the park to be used for a solid waste transfer facility.