There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Safety: Not Sorry Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide for a 7-day waiting period before a semiautomatic firearm, a silencer, armor piercing ammunition, or a large capacity ammunition magazine may be transferred.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
11/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/07/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8582)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 11/07/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/07/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/13/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/10/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/07/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/13/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/13/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 02/14/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/14/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/23/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/23/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/23/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/26/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/26/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/05/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/05/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/05/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/05/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/13/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/13/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/17/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/15/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/01/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/08/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary11/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations11/07/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4268.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4268. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/07/2017)

Gun Safety: Not Sorry Act of 2017

This bill establishes a seven-day waiting period for certain firearm and ammunition transfers between private parties (i.e., unlicensed individuals).