There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To block the implementation of certain presidential actions that restrict individuals from certain countries from entering the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
12/13/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/28/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 11/07/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/07/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/07/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/15/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/15/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/15/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/15/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 12/15/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/15/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/09/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/09/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/09/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/09/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/19/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/19/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/25/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/09/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/09/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/15/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/15/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/17/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/28/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/16/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/17/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/28/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/10/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 12/10/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/10/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/10/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/10/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/10/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/12/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/20/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary11/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security12/13/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs11/07/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security11/07/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security11/28/2017 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)11/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4271. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/07/2017)

This bill prohibits any federal agency funds, resources, or fees from being used to implement or enforce Executive Order 13780 and the presidential proclamation of September 24, 2017. Among the order's major provisions are restrictions on the entry of nationals from Iran, Libya, Somalia, Sudan, Syria, and Yemen and additional limitations on refugee admissions to the United States. The proclamation revised such order to include entry restrictions on nationals from Chad, North Korea, and Venezuela, and remove such restrictions on nationals of Sudan. The proclamation additionally provides for enhanced U.S. vetting capacities.