There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Stress Test Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Stress Test Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Stress Test Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform the Comprehensive Capital Analysis and Review process, the Dodd-Frank Act Stress Test process, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/11/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 174 (Roll no. 137).(text: CR H3112)
03/13/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-593.
11/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/12/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
04/11/2018-5:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/11/2018-5:10pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 174 (Roll no. 137). (text: CR H3112)
04/11/2018-5:02pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 188 - 231 (Roll no. 136).
04/11/2018-4:55pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3128-3129)
04/11/2018-3:24pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Maxine Waters motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Maxine Waters demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion to recommit until later in the legislative day.
04/11/2018-3:24pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
04/11/2018-3:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Maxine Waters motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to require stronger semi-annual stress tests for any global systemically important bank holding company or subsidiary that has engaged in a pattern of unsafe banking practices or any other violations related to consumer harm.
04/11/2018-3:16pmHouseMs. Waters, Maxine moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H3118)
04/11/2018-3:15pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/11/2018-2:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4293.
04/11/2018-2:20pmHouseThe resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules.
04/11/2018-2:20pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 780. (consideration: CR H3112-3119)
03/15/2018-4:24pmHouseRule H. Res. 780 passed House.
03/14/2018-5:55pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 780 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The rule provides for H.R. 4061 and H.R. 4293 to be considered under closed rules.
03/13/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 451.
03/13/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-593.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 38 - 21.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
11/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/15/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 12/21/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/07/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
03/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-593
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4293. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/11/2018)

Stress Test Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to modify testing requirements applicable to bank holding companies and certain nonbank financial companies, including by: (1) establishing limitations on Comprehensive Capital Analysis and Review by the Federal Reserve Board, (2) reducing the frequency of stress testing from semiannual to annual, and (3) otherwise revising provisions related to stress testing.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends the Federal Reserve Act to lower the maximum allowable amount of surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks.