There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To place requirements on operational risk capital requirements for banking organizations established by an appropriate Federal banking agency.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 169 (Roll no. 89).(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1308)
02/23/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-574.
11/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/28/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
02/27/2018-5:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/27/2018-5:38pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 169 (Roll no. 89). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1308)
02/27/2018-5:30pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 185 - 228 (Roll no. 88).
02/27/2018-5:02pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
02/27/2018-4:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Waters(CA) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add an exemption to the underlying bill for any global systematically important bank holding company or subsidiary that has engaged in a pattern or practice of unsafe or unsound banking practices related to consumer harm.
02/27/2018-4:54pmHouseMs. Waters, Maxine moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H1314-1315)
02/27/2018-4:53pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/27/2018-3:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4296.
02/27/2018-3:51pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure.
02/27/2018-3:51pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 747. (consideration: CR H1308-1317)
02/26/2018-7:21pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 747 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4296 and H.R. 4607 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Financial Services for each measure.
02/23/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434.
02/23/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-574.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 17.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/08/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
11/08/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/15/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services11/08/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
02/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-574
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/28/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4296. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/27/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill specifies that a federal banking agency may not establish an operational-risk capital requirement for banking organizations unless the requirement: (1) is based on, and is appropriately sensitive to, current risks; (2) is determined under a forward-looking assessment of potential losses; and (3) allows certain adjustments.

(Sec. 2) The bill amends the Federal Reserve Act to lower the maximum allowable amount of surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks.