There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize Pacific Historic Parks to establish a commemorative display to honor members of the United States Armed Forces who served in the Pacific Theater of World War II, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
05/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-170. (TXT | PDF)
05/07/2018Signed by President.
04/25/2018Presented to President.
04/23/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2354)
03/21/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-216.
12/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9746)
12/06/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-450.
11/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
05/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-170. (TXT | PDF)
05/07/2018Signed by President.
04/25/2018HousePresented to President.
04/24/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/23/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2354)
03/21/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 360.
03/21/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-216.
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/14/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
12/11/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
12/07/2017-5:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/07/2017-5:13pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9746)
12/07/2017-5:12pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9746)
12/07/2017-5:12pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
12/06/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 332.
12/06/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-450.
11/30/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
11/30/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/08/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
11/08/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/14/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/14/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 11/14/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/14/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/28/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/28/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 11/28/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 11/28/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/28/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 11/28/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/28/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/28/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/28/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/28/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/28/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/28/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/28/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 11/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/28/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/28/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/28/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 11/28/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/28/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 11/28/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/28/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/28/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 11/28/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 11/28/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/28/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/28/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/28/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 11/28/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 11/28/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 11/28/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/29/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/29/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/29/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/29/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 11/29/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/29/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/29/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/29/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/29/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 11/29/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/29/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/30/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 12/01/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 12/01/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/04/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 12/04/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/04/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/04/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/04/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/04/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/04/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 12/04/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 12/05/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/05/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/05/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 12/05/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 12/05/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/05/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/05/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 12/05/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/05/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 12/05/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/05/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/05/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/05/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/06/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/06/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/06/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources11/08/2017 Referred to
11/30/2017 Markup by
12/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-450
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/11/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
03/21/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-216
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks02/14/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.4300. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-170 (05/07/2018)

Admiral Lloyd R. "Joe" Vasey Pacific War Commemorative Display Establishment Act

This bill authorizes the Pacific Historic Parks to establish and maintain a commemorative display to honor the members of the U.S. Armed Forces and Allies who served in the Pacific Theater during World War II.

Federal funds may not be used to design, procure, prepare, install, or maintain the commemorative display, but the National Park Service may accept and expend contributions of nonfederal funds and resources for such purposes.