There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Congressional Accountability for Emergency Lending Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Congressional Accountability for Emergency Lending Programs Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Reserve Act to create congressional accountability for emergency lending programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/28/2018Committee on Rules discharged.
11/06/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-1010, Part I.
11/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date All Actions
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 868.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Rules discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/28/2018House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/06/2018House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 7, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/06/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-1010, Part I.
11/14/2017Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 34 - 25.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
11/07/2017Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Introduction and Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 11/13/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/08/2017 Referred to
11/14/2017 Markup by
11/06/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1010
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade11/07/2017 Hearings by
House Rules11/08/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4302. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/08/2017)

Congressional Accountability for Emergency Lending Programs Act of 2017

This bill limits the Federal Reserve Board's emergency-lending authority and otherwise revises provisions related to emergency-lending programs.