There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize and strengthen the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States to more effectively guard against the risk to the national security of the United States posed by certain types of foreign investment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
04/12/2018Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade
11/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Foreign Affairs, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Armed Services, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 11/08/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/08/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/15/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 11/16/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 11/21/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 12/11/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 12/12/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/19/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/10/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/16/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/16/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/16/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/19/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/29/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/29/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/30/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 01/30/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/30/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/08/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 02/08/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 02/14/2018
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 03/05/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/07/2018
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/15/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 03/15/2018
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/15/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/21/2018
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 04/10/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/12/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/12/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 04/13/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/27/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/08/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/08/2018
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/08/2018
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/09/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/11/2018

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/08/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Monetary Policy and Trade04/12/2018 Hearings by
House Energy and Commerce11/08/2017 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection11/10/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)11/08/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services11/08/2017 Referred to
House Budget11/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/08/2017)

Foreign Investment Risk Review Modernization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Defense Production Act of 1950 to expand the scope of "covered transaction" subject to the review of the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States (CFIUS). CFIUS analyzes the national security implications of foreign investment in the United States.

A covered transaction includes:

  • any merger, acquisition, or takeover that could result in foreign control of any U.S. business,
  • the purchase or lease of real estate located in the United States that is in close proximity to a U.S. military installation or to another U.S. government facility or property that is sensitive for reasons relating to national security,
  • other investment in a U.S. critical technology company or U.S. critical infrastructure company,
  • any change in a foreign investor's rights that results in foreign control of a U.S. business,
  • the contribution of intellectual property to a foreign person, or
  • any other transaction, transfer, agreement, or arrangement designed to evade or circumvent the authority of CFIUS.

The bill revises other provisions relating to CFIUS, including the length of its review period, special hiring authority and funding, and authority to mandate reviews or take unilateral action.