There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States to modify temporarily certain rates of duty.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
09/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-239.
09/13/2018Signed by President.
09/06/2018Presented to President.
09/04/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7784-7785)
07/26/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(text: CR S5438)
07/26/2018Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 18).(text: CR H185-385)
11/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
09/13/2018Became Public Law No: 115-239.
09/13/2018Signed by President.
09/06/2018HousePresented to President.
09/04/2018-4:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/04/2018-4:32pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H7784-7785)
09/04/2018-4:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendments to H.R. 4318.
09/04/2018-4:18pmHouseMr. Brady (TX) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H7784-7786)
07/30/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5438)
07/26/2018SenateS.Amdt.3664 Amendment SA 3664 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
07/26/2018SenateS.Amdt.3664 Amendment SA 3664 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S5438; text: CR S5438) To improve the bill.
07/26/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5438)
07/26/2018SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
01/16/2018-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/16/2018-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 0 (Roll no. 18). (text: CR H185-385)
01/16/2018-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H185-385)
01/16/2018-5:05pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/16/2018-4:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4318.
01/16/2018-4:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H395-396)
01/16/2018-4:53pmHouseMr. Bishop (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/09/2017 Referred to
Senate Finance01/17/2018 Referred to
07/26/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4318. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/16/2018)

Miscellaneous Tariff Bill Act of 2018

This bill amends the Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States (HTS) to: (1) repeal expired reductions in rates of duty for specified chemicals and other items; and (2) provide for duty suspensions and reductions through December 31, 2020, for specified chemicals and other items.

The bill amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend through April 22, 2026, (currently, January 14, 2026) the authority of the Department of the Treasury to collect certain customs user fees.