There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Strengthening Oversight of Iran's Access to Finance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Strengthening Oversight of Iran's Access to Finance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Strengthening Oversight of Iran's Access to Finance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to make certifications with respect to United States and foreign financial institutions' aircraft-related transactions involving Iran, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/14/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 252 - 167 (Roll no. 684).
12/07/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-452.
11/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/14/2017-11:27amHouseThe Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 4324.
12/14/2017-11:27amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/14/2017-11:27amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 252 - 167 (Roll no. 684).
12/14/2017-11:16amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 188 - 233 (Roll no. 683).
12/14/2017-11:10amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9916-9918)
12/13/2017-6:52pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Swalwell demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the motion until a time to be announced.
12/13/2017-6:51pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
12/13/2017-6:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit financial institutions participating in certain transactions from engaging in business with a foreign entity that has been found by the Secretary, in consultation with the Director of National Intelligence, to have engaged in or authorized cyber-attacks targeting any election held in the United States.
12/13/2017-6:43pmHouseMr. Swalwell (CA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H9890)
12/13/2017-6:42pmHouseH.Amdt.501 On agreeing to the Gaetz amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
12/13/2017-6:42pmHouseH.Amdt.501 The previous question was ordered on the amendment pursuant to the rule.
12/13/2017-6:39pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 658, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gaetz amendment No. 1.
12/13/2017-6:39pmHouseH.Amdt.501 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gaetz. (consideration: CR H9889-9890; text: CR H9889)
12/13/2017-5:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4324.
12/13/2017-5:29pmHousePrevious question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each bill. It also makes in order specified amendments for the bills.
12/13/2017-5:29pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 658. (consideration: CR H9880-9891; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9880-9881)
12/13/2017-1:57pmHouseRule H. Res. 658 passed House.
12/12/2017-4:55pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 658 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each bill. It also makes in order specified amendments for the bills.
12/07/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
12/07/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-452.
11/14/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 38 - 21.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
11/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services11/09/2017 Referred to
11/14/2017 Markup by
12/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-452
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/18/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4324. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/14/2017)

Strengthening Oversight of Iran's Access to Finance Act

(Sec. 3) This bill sets forth reporting requirements with respect to the export of commercial passenger aircrafts to Iran. The Department of the Treasury must report on financial institutions conducting transactions regarding such exports. Additionally, Treasury must determine if such transactions pose a risk relating to money laundering, terrorism, or other sanctionable activities.

The President may waive the requirements of this bill under certain circumstances.