There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Improving Oversight of Women Veterans' Care Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Improving Oversight of Women Veterans' Care Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Oversight of Women Veterans' Care Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for certain reporting requirements relating to medical care for women veterans provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs and through contracts entered into by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs with non-Department medical providers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 4265)
05/18/2018Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-685.
11/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-5:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 4265)
05/21/2018-4:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4334.
05/21/2018-4:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4265-4267)
05/21/2018-4:50pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 528.
05/18/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-685.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/17/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
11/09/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/09/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1544)
11/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 11/09/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/09/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 11/09/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 11/09/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/14/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/08/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 02/08/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/18/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/18/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs11/09/2017 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-685
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health11/09/2017 Referred to
04/17/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4334.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4334. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/21/2018)

Improving Oversight of Women Veterans' Care Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report to Congress annually on the access of women veterans to gender-specific medical care (mammograms, maternity care, and gynecological care) provided by contracting non-VA medical providers.

(Sec. 3) Each VA medical facility must report quarterly to the VA on the facility's compliance with the environment of care standards for women veterans, which are standards intended to protect the privacy, safety, and dignity of women veterans when they receive medical care. The VA must report to Congress with a plan to strengthen such standards.