There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Servicemember Family Burial Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Servicemember Family Burial Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for headstones and markers for, and interment in national cemeteries of, deceased spouses and dependent children of members of the Armed Forces serving on active duty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/07/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 168).(text: CR H3755)
11/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/08/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/07/2018-7:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/07/2018-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 0 (Roll no. 168). (text: CR H3755)
05/07/2018-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3763)
05/07/2018-4:46pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/07/2018-4:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4335.
05/07/2018-4:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3755-3756)
05/07/2018-4:43pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/20/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
11/09/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/09/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1543)
11/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/14/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs11/09/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs11/09/2017 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/08/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4335.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4335. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/09/2017)

Servicemember Family Burial Act

This bill revises eligibility for Department of Veterans Affairs (VA)-provided memorial headstones and markers that commemorate individuals whose remains are unavailable. The bill makes eligible the spouse or eligible dependent child of a member of the U.S. Armed Forces serving on active duty under other than dishonorable conditions at the time of the spouse's or child's death.

The spouse, minor child, and, in the VA's discretion, unmarried adult child of such a member of the Armed Forces may be buried in any open national cemetery under the control of the National Cemetery Administration.