There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

STEM Research and Education Effectiveness and Transparency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

STEM Research and Education Effectiveness and Transparency Act

Short Titles as Introduced

STEM Research and Education Effectiveness and Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To provide for a report on broadening participation in certain National Science Foundation research and education programs, to collect data on Federal research grants to science agencies, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for a study on broadening participation in certain National Science Foundation research and education programs, to collect data on Federal research grants to science agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 9 (Roll no. 686).(text: CR H10158-10159)
12/18/2017Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-471.
11/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/19/2017-12:15pmHouseUNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent that the clerk be directed to make a change in the engrossment of H.R. 4375.
12/18/2017-7:07pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2017-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/2017-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 376 - 9 (Roll no. 686). (text: CR H10158-10159)
12/18/2017-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10165)
12/18/2017-5:44pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/18/2017-5:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4375.
12/18/2017-5:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10158-10160)
12/18/2017-5:36pmHouseMrs. Comstock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/18/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 350.
12/18/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-471.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
11/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/14/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 12/15/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science, Space, and Technology11/13/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
12/18/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-471
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/18/2017)

STEM Research and Education Effectiveness and Transparency Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to report on the effectiveness of all NSF research and education programs intended to broaden the participation of women and other historically underrepresented individuals in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics disciplines and careers.

(Sec. 3) Each federal agency that expended at least $100 million on research and development in FY2017 shall annually submit to the NSF standardized record-level information on demographics, primary field, award type, review rating, budget request, funding outcome, and awarded budget for all applications for merit-reviewed research and development grants to institutions of higher education and federal laboratories. The first submission must include comparable record-level data for the five previous years.

The NSF shall publish statistical summaries of the data in conjunction with the required biennial reports on the participation of men and women in scientific and engineering positions.