There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Nuclear Energy Research Infrastructure Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Nuclear Energy Research Infrastructure Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Energy Research Infrastructure Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Energy to carry out the construction of a versatile reactor-based fast neutron source, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1094)
02/13/2018Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-557.
11/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/14/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
02/13/2018-5:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/13/2018-5:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1094)
02/13/2018-4:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4378.
02/13/2018-4:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1094-1095)
02/13/2018-4:57pmHouseMr. Weber (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/13/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 419.
02/13/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-557.
11/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
11/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
11/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 11/13/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 11/13/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology11/13/2017 Referred to
11/15/2017 Markup by
02/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-557
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/14/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/13/2017)

Nuclear Energy Research Infrastructure Act of 2017

This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a versatile reactor-based fast neutron source, which shall operate as a national user facility.

DOE must consult with the private sector, universities, national laboratories, and relevant federal agencies to ensure that the versatile neutron source is capable of meeting federal research needs for neutron irradiation services.

DOE must ensure the national user facility will provide fast neutron spectrum irradiation capability and capacity for upgrades to accommodate new or expanded research needs.

DOE must also ensure that full operation of the facility occurs before December 31, 2025.