There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ME TOO Congress Act
Member and Employee Training and Oversight On Congress Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to reform the procedures provided under such Act for the investigation and resolution of allegations that employing offices of the legislative branch have violated the rights and protections provided to their employees under such Act, including protections against sexual harassment, to require the updating of programs of sexual harassment prevention and response training in employment, to institute biennial employment discrimination climate surveys, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
11/15/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (151)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 11/15/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 11/15/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 11/15/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 11/15/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 11/15/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/21/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/21/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 11/21/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/21/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 11/21/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 11/21/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 11/28/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/28/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/28/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/28/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 11/28/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 11/28/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 11/28/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/28/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/29/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/29/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/29/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/30/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/30/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/30/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/30/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/30/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 11/30/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/30/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/30/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 11/30/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/30/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/30/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/30/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/30/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 11/30/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 11/30/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 11/30/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/30/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/30/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 11/30/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/30/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/30/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/30/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 11/30/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/30/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 11/30/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/30/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/30/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 11/30/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 11/30/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/30/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/30/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/30/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/30/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/30/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/30/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/30/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/30/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/30/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/30/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/30/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/30/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/30/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/30/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/01/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/01/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/01/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 12/01/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/01/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/01/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/04/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/04/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/04/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/04/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/04/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 12/04/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/04/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/04/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/05/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/06/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/06/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/06/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 12/06/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 12/06/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/07/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 12/07/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 12/07/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/07/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/07/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/07/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/11/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/11/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/11/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 12/12/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 12/12/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 12/12/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/12/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 12/12/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/12/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/12/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/13/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/13/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 12/13/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 12/13/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 12/13/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/13/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 12/13/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/13/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 12/14/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/15/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/15/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/15/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 12/19/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/19/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/05/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 01/09/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 01/17/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/17/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/18/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/19/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/19/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/30/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration11/15/2017 Referred to

As of 12/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.4396 - ME TOO Congress Act.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.