There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Tariff Act of 1930 to protect personally identifiable information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3359)
04/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-639.
11/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
04/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
04/17/2018-1:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/17/2018-1:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3359)
04/17/2018-1:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4403.
04/17/2018-1:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3359-3364)
04/17/2018-1:10pmHouseMr. Reichert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/16/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 490.
04/16/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-639.
04/11/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/11/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/15/2017 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-639
Senate Finance04/18/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4403. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/15/2017)

Moving Americans Privacy Protection Act

This bill amends the Tariff Act of 1930 to revise requirements regarding the public disclosure of personally identifiable information contained in the manifest of vessels or aircraft entering any U.S. port or place to direct the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to ensure that any such information, including social security numbers, passport numbers, and residential addresses, are removed from any manifest signed and transmitted to the CBP before it is disclosed to the public.