There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 99 Macombs Place in New York, New York, as the "Tuskegee Airmen Post Office Building".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 99 Macombs Place in New York, New York, as the "Tuskegee Airman Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/24/2018Became Public Law No: 115-211. (TXT | PDF)
07/24/2018Signed by President.
07/12/2018Presented to President.
06/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4808)
06/14/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
03/05/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 0 (Roll no. 93).(text: CR H1348)
11/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
07/24/2018Became Public Law No: 115-211. (TXT | PDF)
07/24/2018Signed by President.
07/12/2018HousePresented to President.
06/29/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4808)
06/14/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 459.
06/14/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
06/13/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/06/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/05/2018-7:05pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2018-7:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/05/2018-7:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 0 (Roll no. 93). (text: CR H1348)
03/05/2018-6:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1354)
03/05/2018-5:18pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/05/2018-5:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4406.
03/05/2018-5:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1348-1349)
03/05/2018-5:12pmHouseMr. Palmer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/06/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/06/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
11/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government11/15/2017 Referred to
02/06/2018 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/06/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
06/14/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4406. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-211 (07/24/2018)

(Sec. 1) Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 99 Macombs Place in New York, New York, as the "Tuskegee Airmen Post Office Building."