There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3s101 Rockwell Street in Warrenville, Illinois, as the "Corporal Jeffery Allen Williams Post Office Building".

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3s101 Rockwell Street in Warrenville, Illinois, as the "Corporal Jeffrey Allen Williams Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-316. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H10080)
11/15/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7063-7064; text: CR S7063-7064)
09/28/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
07/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6205)
11/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/14/2018Became Public Law No: 115-316. (TXT | PDF)
12/14/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018HousePresented to President.
12/11/2018-4:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-4:14pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10080)
12/11/2018-4:13pmHouseMr. Mitchell asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H10080)
11/16/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/15/2018SenatePassed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7063-7064; text: CR S7063-7064)
09/28/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
09/28/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
09/26/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/16/2018-3:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/16/2018-3:51pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6205)
07/16/2018-3:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4407.
07/16/2018-3:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6205-6206)
07/16/2018-3:43pmHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/23/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
05/23/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform11/15/2017 Referred to
05/23/2018 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/17/2018 Referred to
09/26/2018 Markup by
09/28/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4407.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4407. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-316 (12/14/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3s101 Rockwell Street in Warrenville, Illinois, as the "Corporal Jeffrey Allen Williams Post Office Building."