There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securing DHS Firearms Act of 2017
Securing Department of Homeland Security Firearms Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing DHS Firearms Act of 2017
Securing Department of Homeland Security Firearms Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing DHS Firearms Act of 2017
Securing Department of Homeland Security Firearms Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Under Secretary for Management of the Department of Homeland Security to achieve security of sensitive assets among the components of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/09/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H50)
01/09/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-496.
11/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/10/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
01/09/2018-2:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/09/2018-2:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H50)
01/09/2018-2:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4433.
01/09/2018-2:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H50-51)
01/09/2018-2:15pmHouseMr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/09/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 369.
01/09/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-496.
12/13/2017HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency Discharged.
12/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
12/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/28/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
11/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
11/16/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1582-1583)
11/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 11/16/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 01/08/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security11/16/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
01/09/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-496
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency11/28/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/10/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4433.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4433. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/09/2018)

Securing Department of Homeland Security Firearms Act of 2017 or the Securing DHS Firearms Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill makes the Under Secretary for Management of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) responsible for the security of DHS firearms and other sensitive assets."Sensitive assets" are defined as any asset, regardless of value, that DHS issues to a DHS employee and that the Under Secretary or a component head determines requires special control and accounting.

(Sec. 4) The Under Secretary shall develop and disseminate a directive for achieving adequate security over such assets across DHS, which shall include: (1) descriptions of what equipment is classified as a sensitive asset, (2) requirements for securing such assets, (3) a classification system for all categories of DHS-issued badges and corresponding requirements for safeguarding such assets, and (4) reporting and record keeping requirements for lost assets (defined to include loss by theft). The Under Secretary shall update such directive within one year, including by adding a requirement relating to recording in the inventory systems maintained by each DHS component the acceptance or transfer of a sensitive asset.

The Under Secretary shall disseminate a revised version of the Personal Property Asset Management Program Manual that includes:

  • requirements for component heads to develop procedures to safeguard firearms and other sensitive assets during on- and off-duty time;
  • requirements for the issuance of safety locking devices and policies on the use of such assets;
  • requirements for training on safeguarding such assets;
  • instructions for reporting and recording lost sensitive assets and an enforcement mechanism to ensure that supervisors maintain such records; and
  • a requirement that a file on a lost asset contain the DHS report and the corresponding police report.

(Sec. 5) DHS components must:

  • comply with federal law, executive branch guidance, and DHS policy regarding the management and oversight of securing sensitive assets;
  • review the need for non-law enforcement badges;
  • require personnel to comply with requirements for safeguarding sensitive assets and reporting on lost assets; and
  • require that lost assets are reported to local law enforcement, the National Crime Information Center, and DHS headquarters and recorded in inventory systems in the time frame established by the security directive.

(Sec. 6) The Inspector General of DHS shall, on an ongoing basis, review implementation of this bill and report to Congress on the progress and effectiveness of the directive for safeguarding firearms and sensitive assets.